CT SB00407 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Commissioner of Economic and Community Development, in consultation with the Office of Workforce Strategy and regional workforce development boards, to develop and implement a Post-COVID-19 Women's Return to Work Economic Development Plan.
Title
An Act Concerning The Development And Implementation Of A Post-covid-19 Women's Return To Work Economic Development Plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 238 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 210 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 210 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Special Act 22-22 |
2022-05-04 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2022-05-04 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2022-05-04 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-28 | Senate | House Calendar Number 510 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-27 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5414 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-19 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-31 | Senate | File Number 251 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 202 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/15 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |