CT SB00402 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To add the vice-chairperson of the faculty advisory committee to serve as an ex-officio, nonvoting member of the Board of Regents for Higher Education.
Title
An Act Concerning Faculty Representation On The Board Of Regents For Higher Education.
Sponsors
House Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee | Sen. Anthony Musto [D] | Sen. Stephen Cassano [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 299 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 181 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 181 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Public Act 14-208 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2014-05-07 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2014-04-25 | Senate | House Calendar Number 476 |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3358 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-15 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2014-04-03 | Senate | File Number 328 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 230 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |