CT SB00402 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-27 - House Calendar Number 452
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-27 - House Calendar Number 452
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require a report on how to facilitate a green chemical industry in this state and to change the requirements of the Department of Economic and Community Development's economic strategic plan.
Title
An Act Concerning The Department Of Economic And Community Development's Economic Strategic Plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 181 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-27 | House Calendar Number 452 | |
2012-04-27 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-25 | On Consent Calendar | |
2012-04-25 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-04-25 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3463 | |
2012-04-10 | File Number 339 | |
2012-04-10 | Senate Calendar Number 255 | |
2012-04-10 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-04-10 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-02 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/12 10:00 AM | |
2012-03-23 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-22 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2012-03-09 | Public Hearing 03/15 | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |