CT SB00399 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-03 - Senate Recommitted to Commerce
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-03 - Senate Recommitted to Commerce
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To allow recipients of research and development tax credits under section 12-217n of the general statutes to claim tax credits up to seventy per cent of their total tax due.
Title
An Act Concerning Research And Development Tax Credits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate Recommitted to Commerce |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-19 | Senate | File Number 679 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 433 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/16 5:00 PM |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/10 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |