CT SB00398 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - File Number 652
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - File Number 652
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To provide transparency, oversight and accountability for the state's expenditure of certain federal funds and opioid litigation settlement funds.
Title
An Act Concerning Accountability For The Expenditure Of Federal Coronavirus Relief Funds Received By The State.
Sponsors
House Appropriations Committee | Rep. Craig Fishbein [R] | Sen. Kevin Kelly [R] | Sen. James Maroney [D] |
Rep. Kimberly Fiorello [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Senate | File Number 652 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 465 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/25/22 5:00 PM |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/25 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |