CT SB00397 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-09 - Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-09 - Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To modernize Connecticut trust law in order to allow the state to remain economically competitive, create jobs and retain businesses in the state.
Title
An Act Concerning Adoption Of The Uniform Trust Code, The Connecticut Uniform Directed Trust Act And The Connecticut Qualified Dispositions In Trust Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 335 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5916 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | File Number 579 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 359 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/18 5:00 PM |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/09 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |