CT SB00395 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To provide consumer protections during the application process for a reverse annuity mortgage loan.
Title
An Act Concerning Protections For Consumers Applying For Reverse Mortgages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-25 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-04-05 | Senate | File Number 296 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 168 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Banking |