CT SB00394 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To place certain requirements on insurers for the use of step therapy for prescription drugs.
Title
An Act Concerning Requirements For Insurers' Use Of Step Therapy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 304 (Y: 118 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 265 PASS (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 265 PASS (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Public Act 14-118 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House Passed |
2014-05-04 | Senate | House Calendar Number 517 |
2014-05-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2014-04-24 | Senate | File Number 666 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-24 | Senate | New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/14 5:00 PM |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-04-02 | Senate | File Number 288 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 211 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |