CT SB00391 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - File Number 387
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - File Number 387
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To recommend minor and technical revisions to the transportation and motor vehicle statutes.
Title
An Act Concerning The Recommendations Of The Legislative Commissioners' Office Regarding Minor And Technical Revisions To The Transportation And Motor Vehicle Statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Senate | File Number 387 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 287 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/22 12:00 PM |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/14 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |