CT SB00379 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-17 - File Number 597
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-17 - File Number 597
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit the solicitation, receipt or use by the state and municipalities of private funds for the purpose of carrying out election administration functions.
Title
An Act Prohibiting The Use Of Private Funds By The State And Municipalities For Election Administration Purposes.
Sponsors
House Government Administration and Elections Committee | Sen. Robert Sampson [R] | Rep. Gale Mastrofrancesco [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-27 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-17 | Senate | File Number 597 |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 350 |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/23 12:00 PM |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/20 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |