CT SB00379 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To delay the termination of the minority teacher recruitment task force, to establish the Minority Teacher Recruitment Policy Oversight Council within the Department of Education, and to require the Department of Education to conduct an annual survey of students regarding the effectiveness of minority teacher recruitment programs in the state.
Title
An Act Concerning The Recommendations Of The Minority Teacher Recruitment Task Force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 227 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 252 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 256 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 252 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 256 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Public Act 16-41 |
2016-05-02 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2016-05-02 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-05-02 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-05-01 | Senate | House Calendar Number 551 |
2016-05-01 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5510 |
2016-04-04 | Senate | File Number 445 |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 287 |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/16 10:00 AM |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |