CT SB00377 | 2023 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-06 - Public Hearing 03/10
Pending: Joint Government Administration and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To (1) require certain local election officials to utilize the state-wide centralized voter registration system when performing certain duties related to election administration, and (2) provide a penalty for noncompliance with such requirement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Certain Local Election Officials' Use Of The State-wide Centralized Voter Registration System.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-06SenatePublic Hearing 03/10
2023-03-03SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
2023-03-02SenateDrafted by Committee
2023-02-06SenateVote to Draft
2023-01-18SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback