CT SB00377 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - No Action
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To prohibit noncompete clauses in physician employment contracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Prohibiting The Use Of Noncompete Clauses In Physician Employment Contracts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-22 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22SenateNo Action
2019-04-17SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
2019-04-10SenateFile Number 589
2019-04-10SenateSenate Calendar Number 297
2019-04-10SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-10SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-04SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-25SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-22SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-20SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health
2019-03-19SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-03-01SenateVote to Draft
2019-02-20SenatePublic Hearing 02/25
2019-02-08SenateReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-23SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback