CT SB00376 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-28 - File Number 153
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-28 - File Number 153
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To allow moneys invested in an individual ABLE account, contributions to an individual ABLE account and distributions for qualified disability expenses to be disregarded for the purposes of determining an individual's eligibility for assistance under the state-administered general assistance program.
Title
An Act Concerning The Department Of Developmental Services' Recommendations Regarding Able Accounts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-16 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | Senate | File Number 153 |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 140 |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/22 12:00 PM |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/14 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |