CT SB00374 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-29 - File Number 192
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-29 - File Number 192
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To increase the reimbursable salaries of executive directors of Department of Developmental Services qualified providers and Department of Mental Health and Addiction Services private providers to one hundred twenty-five thousand dollars.
Title
An Act Concerning The Department Of Developmental Services' Recommendations Regarding The Reimbursable Salaries Of Directors Of Qualified Providers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-16 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | File Number 192 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 163 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/14 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |