CT SB00372 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-29 - File Number 190
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-29 - File Number 190
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To encourage licensed residential facilities to adopt standards that promote energy efficiency and incorporate environmentally friendly building materials.
Title
An Act Concerning The Department Of Developmental Services' Recommendations Regarding Green Initiatives In Residential Facilities Licensed By The Department.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-16 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | File Number 190 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 161 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/14 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |