CT SB00371 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-05 - File Number 318
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-05 - File Number 318
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To permit infection prevention and control specialists to provide services to adjacently located and commonly owned or operated facilities and permit the Commissioner of Public Health to waive infection prevention and control specialist requirements.
Title
An Act Concerning The Provision Of Services To Adjacently Located And Commonly Owned Or Operated Facilities By Infection Prevention And Control Specialists And The Provision Of Assisted Living Services By Certain Elderly Housing Complexes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | Senate | File Number 318 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 237 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/21 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |