CT SB00367 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - File Number 574
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - File Number 574
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To review employment and retirement benefits for state employees and elected or appointed officials.
Title
An Act Concerning Health Care And Retirement Benefits For State Employees And Elected Or Appointed Officials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 46 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Senate | File Number 574 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 348 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/18 5:00 PM |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/28 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |