CT SB00365 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-04 - File Number 261
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-04 - File Number 261
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require that providers contracting with the Department of Social Services for reimbursement under the medical assistance program provide training to staff on workplace violence prevention and to authorize the department to offer rate enhancements for escorts for home visits deemed hazardous and for timely reporting of workplace violence.
Title
An Act Concerning Safety In The Health Care Workforce.
Sponsors
House Human Services Committee | Sen. Saud Anwar [D] | Sen. Matthew Lesser [D] | Rep. Susan Johnson [D] |
Rep. Gary Turco [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | File Number 261 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 187 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/14 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |