CT SB00364 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-01 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-01 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To lower the excess cost threshold from four and one-half times to two times the average per pupil educational costs of a board of education.
Title
An Act Requiring Reports Concerning Special Education Expenditures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-30 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 25 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-05-01 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-04-11 | Senate | File Number 421 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 246 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |