CT SB00361 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - File Number 141
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - File Number 141
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To authorize regional educational service centers to enter into agreements with school districts to provide administrative services, and to permit school districts to use the aggregate expenditure data of a cooperative arrangement for purposes of reporting requirements.
Title
An Act Concerning The Provision Of Administrative Services By Regional Educational Service Centers For School Districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Senate | File Number 141 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 116 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |