CT SB00356 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To pursue alternative apprenticeship models to encourage growth in the manufacturing talent pipeline.
Title
An Act Establishing The Connecticut Apprenticeship And Education Committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 377 (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 111 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 111 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Public Act 19-68 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2019-06-05 | Senate | House Passed |
2019-05-10 | Senate | House Calendar Number 554 |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-08 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-03 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-04-02 | Senate | File Number 313 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 176 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |