CT SB00356 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To pursue alternative apprenticeship models to encourage growth in the manufacturing talent pipeline.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Establishing The Connecticut Apprenticeship And Education Committee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 377 (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 111 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-26SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-19SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-19SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-14SenatePublic Act 19-68
2019-06-05SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-05SenateHouse Passed
2019-05-10SenateHouse Calendar Number 554
2019-05-10SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-08SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-05-08SenateSenate Passed
2019-05-03SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-03SenateNo New File by Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-03SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-03SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-02SenateJoint Favorable
2019-04-24SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
2019-04-02SenateFile Number 313
2019-04-02SenateSenate Calendar Number 176
2019-04-02SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-02SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-27SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-18SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-14SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-02-27SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
2019-02-26SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-02-19SenateVote to Draft
2019-02-08SenatePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-01-29SenateReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-23SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees

Connecticut State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=SB00356&which_year=2019
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00356-R00-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00356-R01-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00356-R02-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00356-R03-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/ACT/pa/pdf/2019PA-00068-R00SB-00356-PA.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/s/pdf/2019SB-00356-R00LAB-CV9-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/s/pdf/2019SB-00356-R00LAB-CV79-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/s/pdf/2019SB-00356-R00LAB-CV126-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/s/pdf/2019SB-00356-R00APP-CV34-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00111-R00SB00356-SV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/h/pdf/2019HV-00377-R00SB00356-HV.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback