CT SB00356 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-02 - House Calendar Number 438
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-02 - House Calendar Number 438
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To remove a prohibition on the compensation of members of boards of education.
Title
An Act Concerning Compensation Of Board Of Education Members.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 126 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 127 (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 127 (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | House | House Calendar Number 438 |
2024-05-02 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4089 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | File Number 187 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 144 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/24 12:00 PM |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |