CT SB00355 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Commissioner of Housing to adopt regulations concerning a limited time period for which a landlord may consider the criminal record of a prospective tenant.
Title
An Act Concerning A Landlord's Ability To Consider The Criminal Record Of Prospective Tenants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2021-03-23 | Senate | File Number 107 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 116 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |