CT SB00355 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide certain benefits to members of the Hmong Laotian special guerilla units who served in the secret war in the Kingdom of Laos during the Vietnam War.
Title
An Act Concerning Hmong Laotian Special Guerilla Units Serving In The Kingdom Of Laos.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |