CT SB00351 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-02 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-02 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To make various changes and additions to the public health statutes on matters affecting physicians and hospitals.
Title
An Act Concerning Matters Affecting Physicians, Health Care Facilities And Medical Foundations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 301 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 247 AS AMENDED (Y: 138 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 305 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 185 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A, B (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 184 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 5012 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 189 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A, B (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 188 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 5012 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 247 AS AMENDED (Y: 138 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 305 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 185 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A, B (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 184 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 5012 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 189 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A, B (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 188 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 5012 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-02 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Public Act 16-95 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-05-03 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B |
2016-05-03 | Senate | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6067 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B |
2016-05-03 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-29 | Senate | House Calendar Number 508 |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 5167 |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5012 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-19 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-04-07 | Senate | File Number 557 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 350 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |