CT SB00347 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - House Calendar Number 642
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To declare void as against the public policy certain real estate contracts that encourage a buyer of real property to use the real estate closing services offered by a financial institution that is the seller of the real property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Contracts For The Sale Of Real Property Located In This State.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 193 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22SenateHouse Calendar Number 642
2019-05-22SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-21SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-05-21SenateSenate Passed
2019-04-25SenateFile Number 794
2019-04-25SenateSenate Calendar Number 386
2019-04-25SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-25SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-18SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-10SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-08SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-29SenatePublic Hearing 04/03
2019-03-20SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-19SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-02-01SenateVote to Draft
2019-01-23SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback