CT SB00347 | 2014 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-16 - File Number 573
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To review appropriations from funds other than the General Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Expenditures Of Appropriated Funds Other Than The General Fund.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-16SenateFile Number 573
2014-04-16SenateSenate Calendar Number 383
2014-04-16SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2014-04-16SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2014-04-10SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/14 5:00 PM
2014-04-02SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2014-04-01SenateJoint Favorable
2014-03-20SenatePublic Hearing 03/25
2014-02-27SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Appropriations

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback