CT SB00346 | 2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To: (1) Establish the ConnectHealth Program, the ConnectHealth Trust Account and the ConnectHealth Advisory Board; (2) require the Comptroller, in consultation with the ConnectHealth Advisory Board and the Office of Health Strategy, to establish the ConnectHealth Plan; (3) authorize the Comptroller to offer coverage to plan participants and beneficiaries in this state under a multiemployer plan, nonprofit employers and their employees, and small employers and their employees; and (4) require the Commissioner of Social Services to seek to amend the federal waiver for the state-wide dental plan that provides for the administration of the dental services portion of the department's medical assistance to expand coverage to include additional individuals in this state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Public Options For Health Care In Connecticut.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 10 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2020-03-10SenateJoint Favorable
2020-03-02SenatePublic Hearing 03/05
2020-02-27SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback