CT SB00346 | 2016 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

To raise the maximum term of imprisonment in the case of evasion of responsibility when a person is injured or property is damaged.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Penalties For Evasion Of Responsibility By An Operator Of A Motor Vehicle In The Case Of Injury.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 258 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 224 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 228 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-31SenateSigned by the Governor
2016-05-18SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2016-05-18SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2016-05-16SenatePublic Act 16-94
2016-05-03SenateIn Concurrence
2016-05-03SenateOn Consent Calendar
2016-05-03SenateHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2016-05-03SenateHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2016-04-30SenateHouse Calendar Number 536
2016-04-30SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2016-04-28SenateOn Consent Calendar
2016-04-28SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2016-04-28SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5474
2016-04-12SenateFile Number 589
2016-04-12SenateSenate Calendar Number 372
2016-04-12SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2016-04-12SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2016-04-05SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/16 5:00 PM
2016-03-30SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2016-03-30SenateJoint Favorable
2016-03-03SenatePublic Hearing 03/07
2016-03-02SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback