CT SB00346 | 2015 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

To clarify certain authorities of the Commissioner of Agriculture under the department's Farmland Restoration and Vacant Public Lands programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Farmland Restoration And Vacant Lands Programs Of The Department Of Agriculture.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 166 (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 145 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-04SenateSigned by the Governor
2015-05-29SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2015-05-29SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2015-05-26SenatePublic Act 15-22
2015-05-19SenateIn Concurrence
2015-05-19SenateHouse Passed
2015-05-08SenateHouse Calendar Number 520
2015-05-08SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2015-05-07SenateOn Consent Calendar
2015-05-07SenateSenate Passed
2015-03-17SenateFile Number 85
2015-03-17SenateSenate Calendar Number 111
2015-03-17SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2015-03-17SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2015-03-10SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/16/15 5:00 PM
2015-03-03SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2015-02-27SenateJoint Favorable
2015-02-06SenatePublic Hearing 02/13
2015-01-22SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Environment

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback