CT SB00346 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-16 - File Number 572
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-16 - File Number 572
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To review expenditures of the Judicial Department, the Division of Criminal Justice and the Public Defender Services Commission.
Title
An Act Concerning Expenditures Of The Judicial Department, The Division Of Criminal Justice And The Public Defender Services Commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-16 | Senate | File Number 572 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 381 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/14 5:00 PM |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/25 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |