CT SB00346 | 2012 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 2 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-25 - Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To establish a task force that will provide guidance as to the most appropriate sites on which to locate a regional composting facility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Creating A Regional Composting Facility Siting Task Force.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-25 Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
2012-04-17 Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2012-04-17 No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
2012-04-16 Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2012-04-16 Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2012-04-16 Joint Favorable
2012-04-10 Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
2012-04-03 File Number 242
2012-04-03 Senate Calendar Number 206
2012-04-03 Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2012-04-03 Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2012-03-28 Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/12 5:00 PM
2012-03-20 Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2012-03-19 Joint Favorable Substitute
2012-03-05 Public Hearing 03/09
2012-03-02 Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback