CT SB00346 | 2010 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-29 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To deter speeding on state highways by authorizing the installation and use of automated speed enforcement devices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Safety, Licensing, Inspection And Enforcement Responsibilities Of The Department Of Motor Vehicles.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-29 Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2010-04-29 No New File by Committee on Public Safety
2010-04-29 Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2010-04-29 Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2010-04-29 Joint Favorable
2010-04-27 Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Safety
2010-04-14 Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2010-04-14 No New File by Committee on Appropriations
2010-04-13 Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2010-04-13 Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2010-04-12 Joint Favorable
2010-04-08 Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
2010-04-01 File Number 252
2010-04-01 Senate Calendar Number 190
2010-04-01 Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2010-04-01 Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2010-03-26 Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/10 5:00 PM
2010-03-16 Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2010-03-16 Joint Favorable Substitute
2010-02-26 Public Hearing 03/03
2010-02-25 Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback