CT SB00345 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To exempt veterans from payment of the fares for state-owned or state-controlled bus public transportation services.
Title
An Act Exempting Veterans From Payment Of The Fares For Bus Public Transportation Services.
Sponsors
House Veterans' Affairs Committee | Sen. Paul Cicarella [R] | Rep. Dorinda Keenan Borer [D] | Sen. Eric Berthel [R] |
Rep. John Hennessy [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2022-03-30 | Senate | File Number 225 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 181 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |