CT SB00343 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-19 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-19 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) establish a working group to revisit the work of the military occupational specialty task force established under special act 13-5 and the legislative changes enacted in public act 14-131, and (2) establish, and appropriate funds for, a grant program for the reimbursement of certain licensing, certification, registration and tuition fees.
Title
An Act Concerning A Military Occupational Specialty Working Group And A Grant Program For The Reimbursement Of Certain Licensing, Certification, Registration Or Tuition Fees.
Sponsors
House Veterans' Affairs Committee | Rep. Mary Welander [D] | Rep. Jennifer Leeper [D] | Rep. Amy Morrin Bello [D] |
Rep. Jaime Foster [D] | Rep. Stephanie Thomas [D] | Rep. William Buckbee [R] | Sen. Paul Cicarella [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-18 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-19 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-30 | Senate | File Number 223 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 179 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |