CT SB00334 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To (1) allow an electric distribution company to recover costs associated with the shared clean energy facilities pilot program, (2) make changes regarding contracting in connection with the purchasing pool for electricity, (3) make changes to the requirements for energy performance standards and life-cycle cost analyses, (4) remove the federal weatherization program from the purview of the Department of Social Services, and (5) make other conforming and technical changes.
Title
An Act Concerning Revisions To Certain Energy Purchasing Pool And Life-cycle Cost Analyses Statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 295 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 122 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 122 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 126 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 122 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 126 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Public Act 16-173 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2016-05-04 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2016-05-04 | Senate | House Passed |
2016-04-21 | Senate | House Calendar Number 445 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-19 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2016-04-11 | Senate | File Number 577 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 366 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/16 10:00 AM |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/10 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |