CT SB00326 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - File Number 682
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - File Number 682
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit the sale of flavored cigarettes, tobacco products, electronic nicotine delivery systems and vapor products.
Title
An Act Concerning The Sale Of Certain Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems, Vapor Products, Cigarettes And Tobacco Products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Senate | File Number 682 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-05-12 | Senate | New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/11/21 5:00 PM |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2021-03-22 | Senate | File Number 98 |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 114 |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/21 10:00 AM |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/08 |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |