CT SB00325 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-22 - House Calendar Number 448
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-22 - House Calendar Number 448
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit water companies from assessing certain charges to municipalities and require them to obtain approval prior to the installation of water lines and hydrants.
Title
An Act Prohibiting The Assessment Of Certain Charges And Requiring Approval For The Installation Of Hydrants By Water Companies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 154 (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-25 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-25 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-22 | Senate | House Calendar Number 448 |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2022-04-12 | Senate | File Number 426 |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 292 |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/09 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |