CT SB00320 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To increase the threshold dollar amount used to determine whether unemployment compensation fraud is a misdemeanor or a felony.
Title
An Act Concerning Raising The Threshold For Unemployment Overpayments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-20 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-20 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-04-04 | Senate | File Number 267 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 221 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/22 12:00 PM |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |