CT SB00320 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To (1) prohibit persons other than attorneys admitted in this state from representing the legal interests of parties to real estate closings concerning real property in this state, and (2) prohibit mortgage lenders from inducing or requiring prospective mortgagors to use preferred attorneys or law firms to represent such mortgagors in proposed mortgage loan transactions concerning real property in this state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Real Estate Closings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 331 AS AMENDED (Y: 128 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 241 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-24SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-24SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-19SenatePublic Act 19-88
2019-06-05SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-05SenateHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05SenateHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-30SenateHouse Calendar Number 673
2019-05-30SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-28SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-28SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9634
2019-05-01SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-01SenateNo New File by Committee on Judiciary
2019-05-01SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-01SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-30SenateJoint Favorable
2019-04-24SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
2019-04-03SenateFile Number 364
2019-04-03SenateSenate Calendar Number 193
2019-04-03SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-03SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-28SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-18SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-14SenateJoint Favorable
2019-02-22SenatePublic Hearing 02/27
2019-02-21SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
2019-02-20SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-01-31SenateVote to Draft
2019-01-23SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback