CT SB00318 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - File Number 266
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - File Number 266
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit an employer from coercing employees into attending or participating in meetings sponsored by the employer concerning the employer's views on political or religious matters.
Title
An Act Concerning Captive Audience Meetings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | Senate | File Number 266 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 220 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/22 12:00 PM |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |