CT SB00318 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-01 - Senate Rejected Bill
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-01 - Senate Rejected Bill
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish a task force to study interventions for at-risk youth.
Title
An Act Establishing A Task Force To Study Interventions For At-risk Youth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 134 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 16 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 146 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 16 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-15 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 146 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 16 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-15 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Rejected Bill |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4696 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2018-03-29 | Senate | File Number 135 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 110 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |