CT SB00317 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require health insurance coverage for certain surgical procedures performed to treat severe obesity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Requiring Health Insurance Coverage For Certain Surgical Procedures Performed To Treat Severe Obesity.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
2019-04-02SenateFile Number 311
2019-04-02SenateSenate Calendar Number 164
2019-04-02SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-02SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-27SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-18SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-14SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-08SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
2019-03-07SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-02-28SenateVote to Draft
2019-02-07SenatePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-01-31SenateReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-23SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback