CT SB00317 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require the Commissioner of Children and Families to report the findings of any investigation into delayed reporting of child abuse or neglect by a mandated reporter employed by a local or regional board of education to such local or regional board of education, the superintendent of the school district in which the mandated reporter is employed and to the Department of Education.
Title
An Act Concerning The Failure To Report Child Abuse And Neglect By Certain Mandated Reporters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-26 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Education |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Education |
2018-03-28 | Senate | File Number 115 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 99 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |