CT SB00317 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To require any person applying for a remedial reading, remedial language arts or reading consultant endorsement to have completed a course that includes instruction on dyslexia.
Title
An Act Concerning Dyslexia.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 240 AS AMENDED (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 221 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 225 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 221 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 225 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Public Act 16-92 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2016-05-03 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-05-03 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-30 | Senate | House Calendar Number 534 |
2016-04-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-28 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5203 |
2016-04-04 | Senate | File Number 437 |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 285 |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/16 10:00 AM |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/02 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |