CT SB00316 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - File Number 114
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - File Number 114
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish a task force to study strategies for the improvement of relationships between residents of child care facilities and the residents of municipalities in which such facilities are located.
Title
An Act Establishing A Child Care Facility Neighbor Relations Task Force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | File Number 114 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 98 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |