CT SB00314 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-13 - File Number 444
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-13 - File Number 444
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To protect warehouse workers from quotas that violate their rights and occupational safety and health standards.
Title
An Act Concerning Protection Of Warehouse Workers.
Sponsors
House Labor and Public Employees Committee | Sen. Martin Looney [D] | Rep. Michael Winkler [D] | Rep. David Michel [D] |
Sen. Saud Anwar [D] | Rep. John Hennessy [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Senate | File Number 444 |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 310 |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |