CT SB00311 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-17 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-17 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To update the definition of sex trafficking.
Title
An Act Concerning The Definition Of Sex Trafficking.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-03-28 | Senate | File Number 109 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 93 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |